OK SB819 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB819
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma Health Care Authority; homestead liens; modifying names of certain entities. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Health Care Authority; homestead liens; modifying names of certain entities. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-04 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 33 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-12 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/12/2017 |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-08 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 11 |
2017-05-04 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2017-04-27 | Senate | HAs read |
2017-04-27 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-26 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 6 |
2017-04-26 | House | General Order |
2017-04-18 | House | Title restored |
2017-04-18 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2017-04-13 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2017-02-27 | House | First Reading |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-02-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 4 |
2017-02-23 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-02-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2017-02-09 | Senate | coauthored by Ownbey (principal House author) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Simpson |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB819 (Carry Over) 2017-05-12 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2017