OK SB817 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB817
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-06 - Second Reading, direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-06 - Second Reading, direct to Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverage licenses; adding commercial passenger bus to licensure; requiring certain alcoholic beverages be purchased from certain licensees; modifying certain license fees. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Alcoholic beverage licenses; adding commercial passenger bus to licensure; requiring certain alcoholic beverages be purchased from certain licensees; modifying certain license fees. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-06 | House | Second Reading, direct to Calendar |
2020-03-16 | House | First Reading |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 7 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 8 |
2020-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author) |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bice |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB817 (Carry Over) 2019-03-11 - Coauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)