OK SB816 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 29 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-29 - Approved by Governor 04/29/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Alcoholic beverages; employee licenses; providing notice of denial. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Alcoholic beverages; employee licenses; providing notice of denial. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-04-10 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-05 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-29SenateApproved by Governor 04/29/2019
2019-04-24SenateSent to Governor
2019-04-24HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-04-24SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-04-23SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-04-23HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-04-23HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
2019-04-23HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-10HouseCR; Do Pass Business and Commerce Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Business and Commerce
2019-03-06HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-06SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-05SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-05SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
2019-03-05SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-02-25SenateCoauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
2019-02-14SenateReported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
2019-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Bice
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback