OK SB810 | 2024 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB810

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-03-20 - Coauthored by Representative Marti (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Medical marijuana; requiring insurance verification for licensees transporting medical marijuana; providing exception for transportation under certain conditions; allowing the Oklahoma Medical Marijuana Authority to revoke exception. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical marijuana; requiring insurance verification for licensees transporting medical marijuana; providing exception for transportation under certain conditions; allowing the Oklahoma Medical Marijuana Authority to revoke exception. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-13 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-20SenateCoauthored by Representative Marti (principal House author)
2023-02-13SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
2023-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Business and Commerce
2023-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Garvin
2023-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB810 (Carry Over) 2023-03-20 - Coauthored by Representative Marti (principal House author)

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback