OK SB803 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-13 - Approved by Governor 05/12/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Corrections; removing requirement for state employees to operate canteen.
Title
Corrections; removing requirement for state employees to operate canteen.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-04-14 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 60 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 66 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2009-04-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 66 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-13 | Approved by Governor 05/12/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-05-06 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2009-05-06 | Enrolled, to House | |
2009-05-05 | Referred for enrollment | |
2009-05-05 | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 3 | |
2009-05-05 | HAs adopted | |
2009-04-21 | HAs read | |
2009-04-21 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-04-20 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-04-20 | Motion expired | |
2009-04-14 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Cooksey | |
2009-04-14 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 66 Nays: 30; Ayes: 60 Nays: 36 | |
2009-04-14 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Tibbs | |
2009-04-14 | General Order | |
2009-04-02 | Title restored | |
2009-04-02 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Safety Committee | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2009-03-03 | First Reading | |
2009-03-03 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-03-02 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-02 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 3 | |
2009-03-02 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-02-23 | coauthored by Cooksey (principal House author) | |
2009-02-23 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-23 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-19 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-11 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary sub-committee | |
2009-02-09 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Public Safety and Judiciary | |
2009-02-05 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Sykes | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |