OK SB801 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Coauthored by Representative Kerbs
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

Oklahoma Nursing Practice Act; modifying authority of Certified Registered Nurse Anesthetists to administer anesthesia and controlled substances. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oklahoma Nursing Practice Act; modifying authority of Certified Registered Nurse Anesthetists to administer anesthesia and controlled substances. Effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11SenateCoauthored by Representative Kerbs
2019-03-07SenateCoauthored by Representative Mize
2019-03-06SenateCoauthored by Representative Cornwell
2019-03-04SenateCoauthored by Representative Davis
2019-02-26SenateCoauthored by Representative McDugle
2019-02-25SenateCoauthored by Senator Scott
2019-02-19SenateCoauthored by Representative McEntire (principal House author)
2019-02-11SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2019-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Smalley
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback