OK SB798 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB798
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Bondsman; allowing for exoneration of bond under certain condition. Effective date.
Title
Bondsman; allowing for exoneration of bond under certain condition. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business & Commerce: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-28 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/28/2023 |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-24 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2023-04-20 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2023-04-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 0 |
2023-04-20 | House | General Order |
2023-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Insurance Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2023-03-23 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 |
2023-03-22 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Moore (principal House author) |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Coleman |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB798 (Carry Over) 2023-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2023