OK SB792 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB792
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Bail bondsmen; stating requirements for accepting collateral, exception to bondsman licensing prohibitions and exoneration of bonds for cash bondsman; providing for state of emergency; requiring cash deposits within certain time. Effective date.
Title
Bail bondsmen; stating requirements for accepting collateral, exception to bondsman licensing prohibitions and exoneration of bonds for cash bondsman; providing for state of emergency; requiring cash deposits within certain time. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - House: Public Safety Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Business, Commerce And Tourism: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/28/2021 |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-26 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-22 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-04-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0 |
2021-04-22 | House | General Order |
2021-04-06 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2021-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Manger (principal House author) |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Leewright |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB792 (Carry Over) 2021-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2021