OK SB788 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Veto message read
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-04 - Veto message read
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Marriage; establishing exception to certain requirements. Effective date.
Title
Marriage; establishing exception to certain requirements. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - House: Rules Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-04-09 - House - House: Rules Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-04 | Senate | Veto message read |
2015-05-04 | Senate | Vetoed 05/01/2015 |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-27 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-22 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-04-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 8 |
2015-04-22 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett, Ritze, Moore, Faught, McCall |
2015-04-22 | House | General Order |
2015-04-09 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McCullough, Brumbaugh |
2015-04-09 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2015-04-07 | House | Referred to Rules |
2015-04-07 | House | Withdrawn from Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee |
2015-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary and Civil Procedure |
2015-03-11 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 6 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-02-24 | Senate | coauthored by Brooks |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2015-02-03 | Senate | coauthored by Echols (principal House author) |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Newberry |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |