OK SB783 | 2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Approved by Governor 03/31/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Schools; modifying provisions of Education Open Transfer Act; providing for establishment of capacity; providing for appeals. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Schools; modifying provisions of Education Open Transfer Act; providing for establishment of capacity; providing for appeals. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-31 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 68 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2021-03-31 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 65 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-02 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Education: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-31SenateApproved by Governor 03/31/2021
2021-03-31SenateSent to Governor
2021-03-31HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2021-03-31SenateEnrolled, to House
2021-03-31SenateReferred for enrollment
2021-03-31HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2021-03-31HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 65 Nays: 30; Ayes: 68 Nays: 19
2021-03-31HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) West (Tammy), Caldwell (Chad), Hilbert, Davis, ODonnell, Echols, Baker, Hasenbeck, McCall
2021-03-31HouseGeneral Order
2021-03-09HouseSecond Reading, direct to Calendar
2021-03-03HouseFirst Reading
2021-03-03SenateEngrossed to House
2021-03-02SenateReferred for engrossment
2021-03-02SenateEmergency passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 14
2021-03-02SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 15
2021-03-02SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2021-02-23SenateEmergency added
2021-02-23SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed
2021-02-19SenateCoauthored by Senator David
2021-02-18SenateCoauthored by Representative Boles (principal House author)
2021-02-02SenateSecond Reading referred to Education
2021-02-01SenateAuthored by Senator Pugh
2021-02-01SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb783&Session=2100
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20INT/SB/SB783%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB783%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/SFLR/SB783%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENGR/SB/SB783%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLR/HFLR/SB783%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20ENR/SB/SB783%20ENR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/SB783%20PCS.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/SB783%20(3-01-21)%20(PUGH)%20FA1.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB783%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB783%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB783%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB783_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2021-22%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB783_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments 750

feedback