OK SB775 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB775
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-25 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
County commissioners; modifying certain duties of boards of county commissioners relating to continuing education. Effective date.
Title
County commissioners; modifying certain duties of boards of county commissioners relating to continuing education. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-25 - House - House: VETO OVERRIDE WITHOUT EMER (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government Senate Bill: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 85 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2023-04-03 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government Senate Bill: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-09 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-25 | Senate | Filed with Secretary of State |
2023-05-25 | House | To Senate |
2023-05-25 | House | Veto overridden: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0 |
2023-04-26 | House | Veto override message received |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Measure sent to House |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Veto overridden: Ayes: 43 Nays: 5 |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Vetoed 04/25/2023 |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-19 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2023-04-18 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2023-04-18 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 85 Nays: 0 |
2023-04-18 | House | General Order |
2023-04-06 | House | CR; Do Pass County and Municipal Government Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government |
2023-02-23 | House | First Reading |
2023-02-23 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-02-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 4 |
2023-02-22 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-02-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Cantrell (principal House author) |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Stewart |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB775 (Carry Over) 2023-05-25 - Filed with Secretary of State