OK SB775 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB775
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Livestock; authorizing the Oklahoma Department of Agriculture, Food, and Forestry to create the Livestock Offender Registry. Effective date.
Title
Livestock; authorizing the Oklahoma Department of Agriculture, Food, and Forestry to create the Livestock Offender Registry. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Casey Murdock [R] | Rep. Eddy Dempsey [R] | Rep. Carl Newton [R] | Sen. Roland Pederson [R] |
Sen. Blake Stephens [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Agriculture And Wildlife: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-30 - House - House: Agriculture and Rural Development Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 37 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Agriculture And Wildlife: DO PASS and referred to second committee (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-21 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/21/2021 |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-15 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-04-15 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-14 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-04-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 4 |
2021-04-14 | House | General Order |
2021-03-30 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Newton |
2021-03-30 | House | CR; Do Pass Agriculture and Rural Development Committee |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Rural Development |
2021-03-16 | House | Remove Representative Newton as principal House author and substitute with Representative Dempsey |
2021-03-09 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 37 Nays: 9 |
2021-03-08 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Stephens |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pederson |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Newton (principal House author) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Murdock |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB775 (Carry Over) 2021-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2021