OK SB767 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Approved by Governor 06/04/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Approved by Governor 06/04/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Administrative Workers' Compensation Act; modifying provisions. Effective date.
Title
Administrative Workers' Compensation Act; modifying provisions. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-05-22 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 64 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House: Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-05-22 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 64 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - House - House: Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 5 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | Senate | Approved by Governor 06/04/2015 |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-05-22 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2015-05-22 | House | To Senate |
2015-05-22 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 0 |
2015-05-22 | House | CCR adopted |
2015-05-22 | House | CCR submitted |
2015-05-22 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2015-05-22 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2015-05-21 | Senate | Title restored |
2015-05-21 | Senate | CCR read |
2015-05-21 | House | House Rule suspended |
2015-05-19 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary and Civil Procedure |
2015-05-19 | Senate | SCs named Sykes, Schulz, Bingman, Marlatt, Fields, Bass, Floyd |
2015-05-19 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2015-04-27 | Senate | HAs read |
2015-04-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 64 Nays: 24 |
2015-04-22 | House | Amended |
2015-04-22 | House | General Order |
2015-04-02 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2015-04-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary and Civil Procedure Committee |
2015-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary and Civil Procedure |
2015-03-11 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 4 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2015-03-04 | Senate | coauthored by Echols (principal House author) |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sykes |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |