OK SB764 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB764
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-21 - Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Medical marijuana; directing State Department of Health to create medical marijuana use registry.
Title
Medical marijuana; directing State Department of Health to create medical marijuana use registry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-18 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-21 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author) |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator McCortney |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB764 (Carry Over) 2019-02-21 - Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author)