OK SB763 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Approved by Governor 04/10/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Approved by Governor 04/10/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Independent Living Act; requiring Department of Human Services to provide certain information. Effective date.
Title
Independent Living Act; requiring Department of Human Services to provide certain information. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - House - House: Children, Youth, and Family Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-17 - House - House: Children, Youth, and Family Services Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-13 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/10/2015 |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-07 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-06 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2015-04-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-06 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hoskin, Sherrer |
2015-04-06 | House | General Order |
2015-03-17 | House | CR; Do Pass Children, Youth, and Family Services Committee |
2015-03-10 | House | Second Reading referred to Children, Youth, and Family Services |
2015-02-23 | House | First Reading |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2015-02-19 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-02-09 | Senate | coauthored by McDaniel (Jeannie) (principal House author) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed |
2015-02-04 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bass |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |