OK SB761 | 2024 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Over of previous SB761

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-23 - Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Public meetings; modifying certain requirements and procedures under the Oklahoma Open Meetings Act. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public meetings; modifying certain requirements and procedures under the Oklahoma Open Meetings Act. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS AMENDED (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-23SenateReported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed
2023-02-13SenateCoauthored by Representative Pae (principal House author)
2023-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to General Government
2023-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Howard
2023-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB761 (Carry Over) 2023-02-23 - Reported Do Pass as amended General Government committee; CR filed

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb761&Session=2400
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20INT/SB/SB761%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/SFLR/SB761%20SFLR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLOOR%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/SB761%20(3-22-23)%20(HOWARD)%20FS%20FA1.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/SB761%20CA1.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB761%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB761%20FA1%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB761_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback