OK SB761 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-26 - Vetoed 05/26/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Status: Vetoed on May 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-26 - Vetoed 05/26/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Workers' compensation; reimbursement rate. Effective date.
Title
Workers' compensation; reimbursement rate. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-20 - House - House: (Y: 91 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - House - House: Conference Committee on Public Safety,: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE TITLE AND ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 38 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-19 - House - House: Conference Committee on Public Safety,: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-04-11 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE TITLE AND ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 12 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-26 | Vetoed 05/26/2011 | |
2011-05-26 | Veto message read | |
2011-05-20 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-20 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-05-20 | Enrolled, to House | |
2011-05-20 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-20 | To Senate | |
2011-05-20 | Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 1 | |
2011-05-20 | CCR adopted | |
2011-05-20 | CCR submitted | |
2011-05-20 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 38 Nays: 1 | |
2011-05-20 | CCR adopted | |
2011-05-19 | Enacting clause restored | |
2011-05-19 | Title restored | |
2011-05-19 | CCR read | |
2011-05-09 | SCs named Jolley, Sykes, Johnson (Rob), Crain, Paddack, Sparks | |
2011-05-09 | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Public Safety, Judiciary and Military Affairs | |
2011-05-04 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2011-04-25 | HAs read | |
2011-04-21 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-04-20 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-20 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 19 | |
2011-04-20 | General Order | |
2011-04-12 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2011-04-12 | Title stricken | |
2011-04-12 | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Judiciary Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2011-03-09 | First Reading | |
2011-03-09 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-08 | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-08 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-02-17 | coauthored by Sullivan (principal House author) | |
2011-02-17 | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Jolley | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
85 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
85 | 327 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |