OK SB757 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-25 - Withdrawn from Calendar; rereferred to Appropriations and Budget Committee
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 21 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-25 - Withdrawn from Calendar; rereferred to Appropriations and Budget Committee
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; vending machine decal fee, multiple machines. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Revenue and taxation; vending machine decal fee, multiple machines. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Randy Bass [D] | Rep. Doug Cox [R] | Sen. Earl Garrison [D] | Rep. Charles Ortega [R] |
Sen. Steve Russell [R] | Sen. Mike Schulz [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-25 | Withdrawn from Calendar; rereferred to Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2011-04-14 | Title restored | |
2011-04-14 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cox | |
2011-04-14 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2011-03-22 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2011-03-21 | First Reading | |
2011-03-21 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-16 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-16 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-16 | coauthored by Bass, Garrison | |
2011-03-16 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-02-28 | coauthored by Ortega (principal House author) | |
2011-02-28 | coauthored by Russell | |
2011-02-28 | Title stricken | |
2011-02-28 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Schulz | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |