OK SB750 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-26 - Approved by Governor 05/26/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]

Summary

Sales tax collection; name of certain agency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales tax collection; name of certain agency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-05-20 - House - House: (Y: 89 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-20 - Senate - Senate: Fourth Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - House - House: General Conference Committee: RECOMMEND CCR (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 13 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-14 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-26 Approved by Governor 05/26/2011
2011-05-20 Sent to Governor
2011-05-20 Signed, returned to Senate
2011-05-20 Enrolled, to House
2011-05-20 Referred for enrollment
2011-05-20 To Senate
2011-05-20 Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 6
2011-05-20 CCR adopted
2011-05-20 CCR submitted
2011-05-20 Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2011-05-20 CCR adopted
2011-05-19 Enacting clause restored
2011-05-19 Title restored
2011-05-19 CCR read
2011-05-18 SCs named Marlatt, Mazzei, Brinkley, Brecheen, Rice, Ivester
2011-05-18 Withdrawn from GCCA - referred to conference
2011-05-09 SCs named GCCA
2011-05-09 Conference granted, naming GCCA
2011-05-05 HAs rejected, conference requested
2011-04-26 HAs read
2011-04-26 Engrossed, signed, to Senate
2011-04-25 Referred for engrossment
2011-04-25 Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 14
2011-04-25 Coauthored by Representative(s) Kirby
2011-04-25 General Order
2011-04-07 Enacting clause stricken
2011-04-07 CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee
2011-03-16 Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2011-03-15 First Reading
2011-03-15 Engrossed to House
2011-03-14 Referred for engrossment
2011-03-14 Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 2
2011-03-14 General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2011-03-14 Senate Rule suspended
2011-02-28 coauthored by Trebilcock
2011-02-28 coauthored by Sullivan (principal House author)
2011-02-28 Title stricken
2011-02-28 Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed
2011-02-08 Second Reading referred to Finance
2011-02-07 Authored by Senator Marlatt
2011-02-07 First Reading

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
682702New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback