OK SB749 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB749
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Agriculture; creating the Urban Gardens Grant Act. Effective date.
Title
Agriculture; creating the Urban Gardens Grant Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 61 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-02 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/02/2017 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-26 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-04-25 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-25 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 61 Nays: 29 |
2017-04-25 | House | General Order |
2017-04-17 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2017-04-06 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee |
2017-03-27 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2017-03-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 6 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Title restored |
2017-03-08 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pittman |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2017-02-13 | Senate | coauthored by Nichols (principal House author) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Matthews |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB749 (Carry Over) 2017-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2017
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
2 | 5 | 120 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 5 | 121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 5 | 122 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
2 | 5 | 123 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |