OK SB749 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-08 - Approved by Governor 02/05/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on February 8 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-02-08 - Approved by Governor 02/05/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; relating to issuance of bonds for equipment purchase; modifying definition of equipment. Effective date.
Title
Schools; relating to issuance of bonds for equipment purchase; modifying definition of equipment. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-02-02 - House - House: (Y: 68 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-04-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2009-04-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-08 | Approved by Governor 02/05/2010 | |
2010-02-03 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-02-03 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-02-03 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-02-02 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-02-02 | To Senate | |
2010-02-02 | Measure passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 31 | |
2010-02-02 | CCR adopted | |
2009-05-20 | CCR submitted | |
2009-05-20 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2009-05-20 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2009-05-20 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2009-05-07 | Conference granted, HC's named Cooksey, Banz, Coody, Kern, Denney, Morrissette, Hamilton, Hilliard | |
2009-05-07 | SCs named GCCA | |
2009-05-06 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2009-05-06 | Vote reconsidered whereby HAs adopted | |
2009-05-06 | Motion to reconsider vote adopted: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2009-05-05 | Notice served to reconsider vote on measure Jolley | |
2009-05-05 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2009-05-05 | HAs adopted | |
2009-04-16 | HAs read | |
2009-04-16 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-04-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-04-15 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 2 | |
2009-04-15 | Amended | |
2009-04-15 | General Order | |
2009-04-07 | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2009-03-05 | First Reading | |
2009-03-05 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-03-04 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-04 | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 | |
2009-03-04 | Title restored | |
2009-03-04 | General Order, Amended | |
2009-03-04 | Senate Rule suspended | |
2009-02-23 | coauthored by Cooksey (principal House author) | |
2009-02-23 | coauthored by Stanislawski | |
2009-02-23 | Title stricken | |
2009-02-23 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-18 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-18 | Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Stanislawski | |
2009-02-11 | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass as amended Appr/Sub-Education sub-committee | |
2009-02-09 | Referred to Appr/Sub-Education | |
2009-02-05 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Cooksey | |
2009-02-05 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Jolley | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |