OK SB747 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Coauthored by Representative Fetgatter (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Income tax; modifying requirements for claiming credit and carry forward allowed for capital investment or new jobs. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Income tax; modifying requirements for claiming credit and carry forward allowed for capital investment or new jobs. Effective date.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-13SenateCoauthored by Representative Fetgatter (principal House author)
2019-02-19SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-19SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Finance
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator McCortney
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback