OK SB745 | 2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB745
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Incentive Evaluation Commission; modifying terms of appointment; modifying membership; modifying frequency of evaluations; requiring development of schedule. Effective date. Emergency.
Title
Incentive Evaluation Commission; modifying terms of appointment; modifying membership; modifying frequency of evaluations; requiring development of schedule. Effective date. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 78 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - House: Rural Development Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance Senate Bill: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-06 - House - House: Rural Development Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance Senate Bill: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-28 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/28/2023 |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2023-04-24 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2023-04-24 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2023-04-20 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2023-04-20 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 2 |
2023-04-20 | House | General Order |
2023-04-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Rural Development Committee |
2023-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Rural Development |
2023-03-20 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author) |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Coleman |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB745 (Carry Over) 2023-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2023