OK SB742 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-14 - Approved by Governor 05/14/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Students; requiring submission of certain reports to the Office of Child Abuse Prevention. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Students; requiring submission of certain reports to the Office of Child Abuse Prevention. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-07 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-14SenateApproved by Governor 05/14/2019
2019-05-08SenateSent to Governor
2019-05-08HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-05-08SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-05-07SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-05-07SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
2019-05-07SenateHAs adopted
2019-04-23SenateHAs read
2019-04-23HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-04-22HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-04-22HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 4
2019-04-22HouseAmended
2019-04-22HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Lawson
2019-04-22HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-04HouseEmergency restored
2019-04-04HouseTitle restored
2019-04-04HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Children, Youth and Family Services Committee
2019-03-25HouseSecond Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services
2019-03-18HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-18SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-14SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-14SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
2019-03-14SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-02-27SenateEmergency clause stricken
2019-02-27SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-27SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
2019-02-26SenateReferred to Appropriations
2019-02-26SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed
2019-02-13SenateCoauthored by Representative Munson (principal House author)
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Smalley
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb742&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/SB/SB742%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB742%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/SB742%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/SB/SB742%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB742%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/SB742%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB742%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/SB/SB742%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB742_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB742_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback