OK SB742 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Motor vehicles; utility vehicles regulations.
Title
Motor vehicles; utility vehicles regulations.
Sponsors
Sen. Don Barrington [R] | Sen. Josh Brecheen [R] | Rep. Joe Dorman [D] | Rep. Tommy Hardin [R] |
Sen. Frank Simpson [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-20 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 59 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-04-20 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-04-05 - House - House: Transportation Committee: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-03 | Approved by Governor 05/03/2011 | |
2011-04-27 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-27 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-04-27 | Enrolled, to House | |
2011-04-26 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-04-25 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2011-04-25 | Motion expired | |
2011-04-20 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Hardin | |
2011-04-20 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 1; Ayes: 59 Nays: 30 | |
2011-04-20 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Dorman | |
2011-04-20 | General Order | |
2011-04-05 | CR; Do Pass Transportation Committee | |
2011-03-16 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | |
2011-03-09 | First Reading | |
2011-03-09 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-08 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2011-03-08 | coauthored by Brecheen | |
2011-03-08 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-02-24 | coauthored by Hardin (principal House author) | |
2011-02-24 | coauthored by Simpson | |
2011-02-24 | Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Senator Barrington | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |