OK SB741 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB741

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Approved by Governor 05/22/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Oklahoma Medicaid Program; pilot program; permitting certain collaboration; providing standards. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oklahoma Medicaid Program; pilot program; permitting certain collaboration; providing standards. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-15 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-04-25 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-22SenateApproved by Governor 05/22/2017
2017-05-16SenateSent to Governor
2017-05-16HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2017-05-16SenateEnrolled, to House
2017-05-15SenateReferred for enrollment
2017-05-12SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2017-05-15SenateHAs adopted
2017-04-26SenateHAs read
2017-04-26HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2017-04-25HouseReferred for engrossment
2017-04-25HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 1
2017-04-25HouseGeneral Order
2017-04-18HouseTitle restored
2017-04-18HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee
2017-04-13HouseRecommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
2017-03-27HouseReferred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee
2017-03-27HouseSecond Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget
2017-03-14HouseFirst Reading
2017-03-14SenateEngrossed to House
2017-03-13SenateReferred for engrossment
2017-03-13SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0
2017-03-13SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2017-03-13SenateCoauthored by Senator Loveless
2017-02-20SenateCoauthored by Representative West (Tammy) (principal House author)
2017-02-15SenateTitle stricken
2017-02-15SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2017-02-15SenateCoauthored by Senator Standridge
2017-02-13SenateReferred to Appropriations
2017-02-13SenateReported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2017-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Pugh
2017-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB741 (Carry Over) 2017-05-22 - Approved by Governor 05/22/2017

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5610118New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb741&Session=1800
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/SB/SB741%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB741%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB741%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENR/SB/SB741%20ENR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENGR/SB/SB741%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/SFLR/SB741%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/HFLR/SB741%20HFLR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/SB741_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/SB741_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback