OK SB738 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Vetoed 06/06/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-28 - Vetoed 06/06/2010
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public health and safety; changing the name of the Office of the Chief Medical Examiner; modifying duties; modifying qualifications; modifying membership of the Board of Medicolegal Investigations. Emergency.
Title
Public health and safety; changing the name of the Office of the Chief Medical Examiner; modifying duties; modifying qualifications; modifying membership of the Board of Medicolegal Investigations. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-05-27 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 58 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-05-27 - House - House: (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2010-05-27 - House - House: (Y: 58 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-04-23 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-28 | Vetoed 06/06/2010 | |
2010-05-28 | Veto message read | |
2010-05-28 | Sent to Governor | |
2010-05-28 | Signed, returned to Senate | |
2010-05-28 | Enrolled, to House | |
2010-05-28 | Referred for enrollment | |
2010-05-27 | To Senate | |
2010-05-27 | Motion expired | |
2010-05-27 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Terrill | |
2010-05-27 | Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 58 Nays: 40; Ayes: 58 Nays: 39 | |
2010-05-27 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cooksey, McCullough, Osborn | |
2010-05-27 | Remove as coauthor Representative(s) Ritze | |
2010-05-27 | 3 CCR adopted | |
2010-05-27 | 3 CCR submitted | |
2010-05-27 | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2010-05-27 | coauthored by Sykes | |
2010-05-27 | 3 CCR adopted | |
2010-05-27 | 3 CCR read | |
2010-05-19 | Further conference granted, same conferees | |
2010-05-18 | 2 CCR rejected, further conference requested, same conferees | |
2010-04-05 | 2 CCR submitted | |
2010-04-05 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2010-04-05 | coauthored by Ritze, Pittman | |
2010-04-05 | 2 CCR adopted | |
2010-03-11 | 2 CCR read | |
2010-02-24 | Conference granted, HC's named Benge, Miller, Martin (Scott), Cox, Ritze, Lamons, McAffrey | |
2010-02-23 | SCs named Coffee, Lamb, Jolley, Leftwich, Johnson (Mike) | |
2010-02-15 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2009-05-12 | Conferees unable to agree | |
2009-05-05 | Conference granted, HC's named Benge, Miller, Martin (Scott), Cox, Ritze, Lamons, McAffrey, McDaniel (Jeannie) | |
2009-05-04 | SCs named Coffee, Jolley, Lamb, Leftwich | |
2009-04-29 | HAs rejected, conference requested | |
2009-04-27 | HAs read | |
2009-04-27 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-04-23 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-04-23 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 4 | |
2009-04-23 | Title stricken | |
2009-04-23 | Amended by floor substitute | |
2009-04-23 | General Order | |
2009-04-13 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lamons | |
2009-04-13 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2009-03-05 | First Reading | |
2009-03-05 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-03-04 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-04 | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 | |
2009-03-04 | coauthored by Jolley | |
2009-03-04 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | |
2009-02-17 | coauthored by Benge (principal House author) | |
2009-02-17 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed | |
2009-02-17 | Pending authorship Representative(s) Benge | |
2009-02-12 | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; pending CR | |
2009-02-05 | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Senator Coffee | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
10 | 1150 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
12 | 2902 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
20 | 1313 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 1154 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
21 | 1168 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
51 | 24A | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 1 | 329 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2 | 315 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 931 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 932 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 933 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 934 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 935 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 936 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 936 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 937 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 937 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 939 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 940 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 941 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 944 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 945 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 947 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 948 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 948 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 949 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 950 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 951 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
63 | 954 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
73 | 342 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |