OK SB733 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-23 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Professions and occupations; modifying definitions and licensing requirements relating to the Oklahoma Inspectors Act; eliminating principal-agent relationship; authorizing renewal of unemployed inspectors. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Professions and occupations; modifying definitions and licensing requirements relating to the Oklahoma Inspectors Act; eliminating principal-agent relationship; authorizing renewal of unemployed inspectors. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 55 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2019-04-03 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-06 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-23SenateHAs read
2019-04-23HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-04-22HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-04-22HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 55 Nays: 27
2019-04-22HouseAmended
2019-04-22HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-04HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Business and Commerce
2019-03-07HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-07SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-06SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-06SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1
2019-03-06SenateTitle restored
2019-03-06SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2019-02-28SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-28SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
2019-02-20SenateCoauthored by Representative Bush (principal House author)
2019-02-14SenateCoauthored by Senator Dugger
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Rader
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb733&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/SB/SB733%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB733%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/SB733%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/SB/SB733%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB733%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/SB733%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB733%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB733_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB733_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback