OK SB731 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB731

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-05 - Remove as author Senator Marlatt; authored by Senator Allen
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Oil and gas; payment of proceeds from oil and gas production. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oil and gas; payment of proceeds from oil and gas production. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 60 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - House: Energy and Natural Resources Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-05SenateRemove as author Senator Marlatt; authored by Senator Allen
2017-04-18SenateHAs read
2017-04-18HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2017-04-17HouseReferred for engrossment
2017-04-17HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 60 Nays: 23
2017-04-17HouseGeneral Order
2017-04-06HouseEnacting clause stricken
2017-04-06HouseCR; Do Pass, as amended, Energy and Natural Resources Committee
2017-03-27HouseSecond Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources
2017-03-22HouseFirst Reading
2017-03-22SenateEngrossed to House
2017-03-21SenateReferred for engrossment
2017-03-21SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0
2017-03-21SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2017-03-13SenateCoauthored by Representative Calvey (principal House author)
2017-03-02SenateTitle stricken
2017-03-02SenateReported Do Pass as amended Energy committee; CR filed
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Energy
2017-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Marlatt
2017-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB731 (Carry Over) 2017-04-18 - HAs read

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
5257010New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback