OK SB730 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB730
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Public health; removing certain provisions relating to veteran centers. Effective date.
Title
Public health; removing certain provisions relating to veteran centers. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House: Veterans and Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - House - House: Veterans and Military Affairs Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-25 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/25/2017 |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-19 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2017-04-18 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2017-04-18 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 2 |
2017-04-18 | House | General Order |
2017-03-28 | House | CR; Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2017-03-20 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 2 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-02-16 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Veterans and Military Affairs committee; CR filed |
2017-02-09 | Senate | coauthored by Ownbey (principal House author) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Simpson |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB730 (Carry Over) 2017-04-25 - Approved by Governor 04/25/2017