OK SB722 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 16-1)
Status: Passed on April 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-16 - Approved by Governor 04/16/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Court-appointed special advocates; adding background check search requirements for applicants. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Court-appointed special advocates; adding background check search requirements for applicants. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-25 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-16SenateApproved by Governor 04/16/2019
2019-04-11SenateSent to Governor
2019-04-11HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-04-11SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-04-10SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-04-10HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-04-10HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 101 Nays: 0
2019-04-10HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Sims
2019-04-10HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-02HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) Hasenbeck, Bush, West (Josh), Hilbert, Echols, McBride, West (Tammy), Newton
2019-04-02HouseCR; Do Pass Judiciary Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2019-02-26HouseFirst Reading
2019-02-26SenateEngrossed to House
2019-02-25SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-02-25SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2019-02-25SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2019-02-25SenateCoauthored by Senator Dahm
2019-02-19SenateReported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed
2019-02-14SenateCoauthored by Representative Lawson (principal House author)
2019-02-13SenateCoauthored by Senator Floyd
2019-02-13SenateRemove as author Senator Floyd; authored by Senator Pemberton
2019-02-13SenateCoauthored by Senator Murdock
2019-02-13SenateCoauthored by Senator Leewright
2019-02-13SenateCoauthored by Senator Sharp
2019-02-12SenateCoauthored by Senator David
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Judiciary
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Floyd
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback