OK SB720 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Died in GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 22 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-22 - Died in GCCA
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Intoxicating liquors; definitions; prohibiting powdered alcohol; setting penalties. Effective date.
Title
Intoxicating liquors; definitions; prohibiting powdered alcohol; setting penalties. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 72 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco, and Controlled Substances Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-04-07 - House - House: Alcohol, Tobacco, and Controlled Substances Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE ENACTING CLAUSE (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 35 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-22 | Senate | Died in GCCA |
2015-05-05 | House | Conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Alcohol, Tobacco, and Controlled Substances |
2015-04-30 | Senate | SCs named GCCA |
2015-04-29 | Senate | HAs rejected, conference requested |
2015-04-22 | Senate | HAs read |
2015-04-22 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-21 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 15 |
2015-04-21 | House | General Order |
2015-04-07 | House | Enacting clause stricken |
2015-04-07 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Alcohol, Tobacco, and Controlled Substances Committee |
2015-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Alcohol, Tobacco, and Controlled Substances |
2015-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 35 Nays: 9 |
2015-03-10 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-03-02 | Senate | coauthored by Derby (principal House author) |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-02-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Newberry |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |