OK SB72 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB72
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Approved by Governor 05/02/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Sales and use tax; repealing exemption in Research and Development Incentives Act. Effective date.
Title
Sales and use tax; repealing exemption in Research and Development Incentives Act. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 29) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-02 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/02/2022 |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2022-04-28 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2022-04-27 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2022-04-27 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 71 Nays: 0 |
2022-04-27 | House | General Order |
2022-04-14 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2022-04-05 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2022-03-30 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance - Revenue and Taxation Subcommittee |
2022-03-28 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2022-03-15 | House | First Reading |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2022-03-14 | Senate | Title restored |
2022-03-14 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Title stricken |
2022-03-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Lepak (principal House author) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Finance committee; CR filed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Bergstrom |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB72 (Carry Over) 2021-02-02 - Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee