OK SB718 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB718
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 5 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-05 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Pharmacy; providing exception to pharmacy requirements for facilities distributing or dispensing dialysate or devices necessary for peritoneal dialysis. Effective date.
Title
Pharmacy; providing exception to pharmacy requirements for facilities distributing or dispensing dialysate or devices necessary for peritoneal dialysis. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-29 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/05/2021 |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-05-03 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2021-04-22 | Senate | HAs read |
2021-04-22 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 0 |
2021-04-21 | House | General Order |
2021-04-08 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee |
2021-04-06 | House | Remove Representative Mize as principal House author and substitute with Representative McEntire |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2021-03-11 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2021-03-10 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2021-02-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Mize (principal House author) |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator McCortney |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB718 (Carry Over) 2021-05-05 - Approved by Governor 05/05/2021