OK SB713 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-06 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2023 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-06 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Fees; increasing amount paid for jury service. Effective date.
Title
Fees; increasing amount paid for jury service. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Carri Hicks [D] | Rep. Judd Strom [R] | Sen. Mary Boren [D] | Rep. Cyndi Munson [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-03 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations Senate Bill: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary Senate Bill: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations Senate Bill: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-15 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary Senate Bill: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-07 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Judiciary: DO PASS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-06 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee |
2023-03-29 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Judiciary Subcommittee |
2023-03-29 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2023-03-01 | House | First Reading |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Title restored |
2023-02-28 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Title stricken |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Boren |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Strom (principal House author) |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2023-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Hicks |
2023-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |