OK SB701 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB701
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil and Environmental
Pending: House Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil and Environmental
Pending: House Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Medical liability actions; prohibiting admissibility of certain action. Effective date.
Title
Medical liability actions; prohibiting admissibility of certain action. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 36 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil and Environmental |
2017-03-22 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 36 Nays: 7 |
2017-03-21 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Echols (principal House author) |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Judiciary committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sykes |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB701 (Carry Over) 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil and Environmental