OK SB70 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 28 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-28 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

State Board of Education; directing the State Board of Education to issue a request for proposals for an information system. Effective date. Emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Board of Education; directing the State Board of Education to issue a request for proposals for an information system. Effective date. Emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-22 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 87 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-28SenateApproved by Governor 05/28/2019
2019-05-22SenateSent to Governor
2019-05-22HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-05-22SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-05-22SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-05-22HouseTo Senate
2019-05-21HouseFourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 2
2019-05-22HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Sharp
2019-05-22HouseCCR adopted
2019-05-22HouseCCR submitted
2019-05-22SenateMeasure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
2019-05-22SenateCCR adopted
2019-05-17SenateTitle restored
2019-05-17SenateCCR read
2019-05-14HouseConference granted, naming Conference Committee on Common Education
2019-05-02SenateSCs named Pemberton, Stanislawski, Haste, Dugger, Hicks, Dossett
2019-04-30SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2019-04-29SenateHAs read
2019-04-29HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-04-25HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-04-25HouseThird Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 0
2019-04-25HouseTitle stricken
2019-04-25HouseAmended
2019-04-25HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-02HouseCR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
2019-03-25HouseSecond Reading referred to Common Education
2019-03-18HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-18SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-14SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-14SenateMeasure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0
2019-03-14SenateEmergency clause restored
2019-03-14SenateTitle restored
2019-03-14SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2019-03-11SenateCoauthored by Representative Caldwell (Chad) (principal House author)
2019-02-27SenateEmergency clause stricken
2019-02-27SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-27SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
2019-02-19SenateReferred to Appropriations
2019-02-19SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Pemberton
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb70&Session=1900
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20INT/SB/SB70%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB70%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/SFLR/SB70%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENGR/SB/SB70%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20FLR/HFLR/SB70%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB70%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCCS/SB70%20CCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2019-20%20ENR/SB/SB70%20ENR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB70_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2019-20%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB70_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback