OK SB70 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB70

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - Second Reading referred to Common Education
Pending: House Common Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Common education; providing for a performance audit on the State Department of Education. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Common education; providing for a performance audit on the State Department of Education. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 28 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-28HouseSecond Reading referred to Common Education
2017-03-23HouseFirst Reading
2017-03-23SenateEngrossed to House
2017-03-22SenateReferred for engrossment
2017-03-22SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 28 Nays: 11
2017-03-22SenateEmergency clause stricken
2017-03-22SenateTitle stricken
2017-03-22SenateGeneral Order, Amended
2017-02-23SenateCoauthored by Representative Sears (principal House author)
2017-02-20SenateReported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed
2017-02-20SenateCoauthored by Senator Loveless
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Education
2017-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Daniels
2017-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB70 (Carry Over) 2017-03-28 - Second Reading referred to Common Education

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
701124Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback