OK SB695 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB695
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/30/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/30/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Ad valorem tax; providing for a specified start date for a five-year exemption for certain qualified facilities. Effective date.
Title
Ad valorem tax; providing for a specified start date for a five-year exemption for certain qualified facilities. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Thompson [R] | Rep. Kyle Hilbert [R] | Rep. Mark Vancuren [R] | Sen. J.J. Dossett [D] |
Sen. Micheal Bergstrom [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-04-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 90 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/30/2019 |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2019-04-25 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2019-04-24 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2019-04-24 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 90 Nays: 4 |
2019-04-24 | House | Amendment restores bill to engrossed version |
2019-04-24 | House | Title restored |
2019-04-24 | House | Amended |
2019-04-24 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Vancuren |
2019-04-24 | House | General Order |
2019-03-28 | House | Title stricken |
2019-03-28 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Bergstrom |
2019-03-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2019-03-14 | House | First Reading |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Title restored |
2019-03-13 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Hilbert (principal House author) |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Dossett |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Thompson |
2019-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB695 (Carry Over) 2019-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/30/2019