OK SB693 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB693
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-27 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-27 - HAs read
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Professions and occupations; Inspectors Act; modifying various sections. Effective date.
Title
Professions and occupations; Inspectors Act; modifying various sections. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Ann Griffin [R] | Rep. John Jordan [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-26 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House: Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 1 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 32 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - House: Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 1 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 32 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-27 | Senate | HAs read |
2018-04-27 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2018-04-26 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2018-04-26 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0 |
2018-04-26 | House | General Order |
2018-04-12 | House | Title restored |
2018-04-12 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2018-04-09 | House | Referred to Rules |
2018-04-09 | House | Withdrawn from Banking and Business Committee |
2018-02-05 | House | Referred to Banking and Business |
2018-02-05 | House | Withdrawn from Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2017-03-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 32 Nays: 10 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Jordan (principal House author) |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Griffin |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB693 (Carry Over) 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 4200 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 4200 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 4200 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 4200 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 4200 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 4200 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 4200 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 4200 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 4200 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |