OK SB687 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB687
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/27/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/27/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Oklahoma 9-1-1 Management Authority; collection and distribution of fees and use of funds. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma 9-1-1 Management Authority; collection and distribution of fees and use of funds. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-21 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-05 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-09 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-19 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Public Safety: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-27 | Senate | Approved by Governor 04/27/2021 |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-22 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2021-04-21 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2021-04-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 0 |
2021-04-21 | House | General Order |
2021-04-08 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ford |
2021-04-08 | House | CR; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2021-04-05 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee |
2021-03-22 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee |
2021-03-22 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2021-03-10 | House | First Reading |
2021-03-10 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 |
2021-03-09 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Humphrey (principal House author) |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2021-02-02 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2021-02-01 | Senate | Authored by Senator Weaver |
2021-02-01 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB687 (Carry Over) 2021-04-27 - Approved by Governor 04/27/2021