OK SB687 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/11/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/11/2016
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Professions and occupations; creating the Massage Therapy Practice Act; licenses; creating the Advisory Board on Massage Therapy. Effective date.
Title
Professions and occupations; creating the Massage Therapy Practice Act; licenses; creating the Advisory Board on Massage Therapy. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Anthony Sykes [R] | Rep. David Derby [R] | Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] | Sen. John Sparks [D] |
Rep. Emily Virgin [D] | Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] | Sen. Ervin Yen [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-05-04 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 68 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2016-04-06 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-30 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-11 | Senate | Approved by Governor 05/11/2016 |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Sent to Governor |
2016-05-05 | House | Signed, returned to Senate |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Enrolled, to House |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Referred for enrollment |
2016-05-04 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 6 |
2016-05-04 | Senate | HAs adopted |
2016-04-18 | Senate | HAs read |
2016-04-18 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2016-04-14 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2016-04-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 68 Nays: 18 |
2016-04-14 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Virgin, Sherrer |
2016-04-14 | House | General Order |
2016-04-07 | House | Title restored |
2016-04-07 | House | Coauthored by Senator(s) Pittman, Yen |
2016-04-07 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2016-03-31 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Natural Resources and Regulatory Services Subcommittee |
2016-03-14 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2016-03-09 | House | First Reading |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 6 |
2016-03-08 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Title stricken |
2016-02-15 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2016-02-15 | Senate | coauthored by Sparks |
2015-02-09 | Senate | coauthored by Derby (principal House author) |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Sykes |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
59 | 4200 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 4200 | 10 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 4200 | 11 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 4200 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 4200 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 4200 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 4200 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 4200 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 4200 | 5 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 4200 | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 4200 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 4200 | 8 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
59 | 4200 | 9 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |