OK SB672 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Utilities
Pending: House Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Utilities
Pending: House Utilities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Telecommunications; modifying certain fees; modifying Oklahoma Universal Service Fund. Effective date.
Title
Telecommunications; modifying certain fees; modifying Oklahoma Universal Service Fund. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-11 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-17 | House | Second Reading referred to Utilities |
2015-03-11 | House | First Reading |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 4 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-03-11 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2015-03-10 | Senate | coauthored by Christian (principal House author) |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Energy committee; CR filed |
2015-02-03 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Energy |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Authored by Senator Griffin |
2015-02-02 | Senate | First Reading |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
17 | 139 | 102 | New Code | See Bill Text |
17 | 139 | 107 | New Code | See Bill Text |
63 | 2843 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |