OK SB671 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB671
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-11 - Referred to Actuary pursuant to the Oklahoma Pension Legislation Actuarial Analysis Act
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-11 - Referred to Actuary pursuant to the Oklahoma Pension Legislation Actuarial Analysis Act
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Teachers retirement; authorizing termination of certain tax programs; eliminating certain funding. Effective date.
Title
Teachers retirement; authorizing termination of certain tax programs; eliminating certain funding. Effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Brown [R] | Rep. Lewis Moore [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-08 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | House | Referred to Actuary pursuant to the Oklahoma Pension Legislation Actuarial Analysis Act |
2017-03-27 | House | Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions |
2017-03-09 | House | First Reading |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Moore (principal House author) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Brown |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB671 (Carry Over) 2017-04-11 - Referred to Actuary pursuant to the Oklahoma Pension Legislation Actuarial Analysis Act
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
70 | 17 | 102 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 17 | 105 | New Code | See Bill Text |
70 | 17 | 106 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 1316 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |