OK SB671 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 13 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Oklahoma Children's Code; expanding definition of persons responsible for a child's health, safety, and welfare. Effective date.
Title
Oklahoma Children's Code; expanding definition of persons responsible for a child's health, safety, and welfare. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] | Sen. Tom Ivester [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-18 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2013-03-13 | House | First Reading |
2013-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 1 |
2013-03-12 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-02-11 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2013-02-05 | Senate | coauthored by Sherrer (principal House author) |
2013-02-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Authored by Senator Ivester |
2013-02-04 | Senate | First Reading |