OK SB670 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by Governor 04/30/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Professional and occupational licensure; Post-Military Service Occupation, Education and Credentialing Act; directing acceptance of license from other states. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Professional and occupational licensure; Post-Military Service Occupation, Education and Credentialing Act; directing acceptance of license from other states. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-10 - House - House: Government Efficiency Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 41 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30SenateApproved by Governor 04/30/2019
2019-04-25SenateSent to Governor
2019-04-25HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-04-25SenateEnrolled, to House
2019-04-24SenateReferred for enrollment
2019-04-24HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2019-04-24HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 0
2019-04-24HouseCoauthored by Senator(s) Ikley-Freeman
2019-04-24HouseGeneral Order
2019-04-10HouseCR; Do Pass Government Efficiency Committee
2019-03-27HouseReferred to Government Efficiency
2019-03-27HouseWithdrawn from Rules Committee
2019-03-19HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2019-03-14HouseFirst Reading
2019-03-14SenateEngrossed to House
2019-03-13SenateReferred for engrossment
2019-03-13SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0
2019-03-13SenateTitle restored
2019-03-13SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2019-02-20SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-20SenateReported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed
2019-02-19SenateCoauthored by Representative McCall (principal House author)
2019-02-14SenateReferred to Appropriations
2019-02-14SenateTitle stricken
2019-02-14SenateReported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
2019-02-05SenateSecond Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2019-02-04SenateAuthored by Senator Pugh
2019-02-04SenateFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback