OK SB669 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB669

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 23 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-05 - Remove as author Senator Marlatt; authored by Senator Allen
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Oil and gas; horizontal drilling; pooling orders for horizontal spacing units.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Oil and gas; horizontal drilling; pooling orders for horizontal spacing units.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-13 - House - House: Energy and Natural Resources Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE E NACTING CLAUSE (Y: 12 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-05SenateRemove as author Senator Marlatt; authored by Senator Allen
2017-04-13HouseEnacting clause stricken
2017-04-13HouseCoauthored by Representative(s) McBride
2017-04-13HouseCR; Do Pass, as amended, Energy and Natural Resources Committee
2017-03-28HouseSecond Reading referred to Energy and Natural Resources
2017-03-23HouseFirst Reading
2017-03-23SenateEngrossed to House
2017-03-22SenateReferred for engrossment
2017-03-22SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0
2017-03-22SenateEmergency clause stricken
2017-03-22SenateTitle stricken
2017-03-22SenateEmergency added
2017-03-22SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2017-03-13SenateCoauthored by Representative O'Donnell (principal House author)
2017-03-02SenateReported Do Pass Energy committee; CR filed
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Energy
2017-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Marlatt
2017-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB669 (Carry Over) 2017-04-13 - Enacting clause stricken

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
52871New CodeSee Bill Text
52876New CodeSee Bill Text
52877New CodeSee Bill Text
52878New CodeSee Bill Text
52879New CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback