OK SB668 | 2023 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future SB668

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2023
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Uniform Controlled Dangerous Substances Act; removing specified precursor substances from certain permitting requirement. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Uniform Controlled Dangerous Substances Act; removing specified precursor substances from certain permitting requirement. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2023-04-05 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Committee: DO PASS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-20 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health & Human Services: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health & Human Services Senate Bill: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-04-26SenateApproved by Governor 04/26/2023
2023-04-20SenateSent to Governor
2023-04-20HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2023-04-20SenateEnrolled, to House
2023-04-19SenateReferred for enrollment
2023-04-19HouseSigned, returned to Senate
2023-04-19HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 0
2023-04-19HouseGeneral Order
2023-04-05HouseCR; Do Pass Judiciary - Criminal Committee
2023-03-29HouseSecond Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal
2023-03-21HouseFirst Reading
2023-03-21SenateEngrossed to House
2023-03-20SenateReferred for engrossment
2023-03-20SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0
2023-03-20SenateGeneral Order, Considered
2023-03-06SenateCoauthored by Representative Worthen (principal House author)
2023-02-23SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Health and Human Services committee; CR filed
2023-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Health and Human Services
2023-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Standridge
2023-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB668 (Carry Over) 2023-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2023

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb668&Session=2300
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20INT/SB/SB668%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB668%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/SFLR/SB668%20SFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENGR/SB/SB668%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20FLR/HFLR/SB668%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20ENR/SB/SB668%20ENR.PDF
Amendmenthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20COMMITTEE%20AMENDMENTS/Senate/SB668%20PCS.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB668%20INT%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/Senate/SB668%20CS%20BILLSUM.PDF
Supplementhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/BILLSUM/House/SB668%20ENGR%20BILLSUM.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/Senate/SB668_VOTES.HTM
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf/2023-24%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/votes/House/SB668_VOTES.HTM

Bill Comments

feedback