OK SB667 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SB667
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-20 - Coauthored by Representative McBride (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-20 - Coauthored by Representative McBride (principal House author)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Teachers retirement; military service to include recent service; authorizing military service to count towards retirement. Effective date.
Title
Teachers retirement; military service to include recent service; authorizing military service to count towards retirement. Effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-20 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative McBride (principal House author) |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Referred to Legislative Actuary under 62 O.S., Section 3108 |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Authored by Senator Newberry |
2017-02-06 | Senate | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SB667 (Carry Over) 2017-04-04 - Referred to Legislative Actuary under 62 O.S., Section 3108