OK SB657 | 2018 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SB657

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on May 31 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-31 - Died in conference
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

Mental health providers; creating the Protection Against Sexual Exploitation By a Mental Health Service Provider Act. Effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mental health providers; creating the Protection Against Sexual Exploitation By a Mental Health Service Provider Act. Effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-04 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-31SenateDied in conference
2017-05-11SenateSCs named GCCA
2017-05-10HouseConference granted, naming Conference Committee on Public Health
2017-05-04SenateHAs rejected, conference requested
2017-04-19SenateHAs read
2017-04-19HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2017-04-18HouseReferred for engrossment
2017-04-18HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 0
2017-04-18HouseEnacting clause stricken
2017-04-18HouseAmended
2017-04-18HouseGeneral Order
2017-04-04HouseTitle restored
2017-04-04HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Public Health Committee
2017-03-27HouseSecond Reading referred to Public Health
2017-03-22HouseFirst Reading
2017-03-22SenateEngrossed to House
2017-03-21SenateReferred for engrossment
2017-03-21SenateMeasure passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0
2017-03-21SenateGeneral Order, Amended by Floor Substitute
2017-03-09SenateCoauthored by Representative Ritze (principal House author)
2017-03-01SenateTitle stricken
2017-03-01SenateReported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations committee; CR filed
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Appropriations
2017-02-09SenateReported Do Pass as amended Public Safety committee; CR filed
2017-02-09SenateTitle stricken
2017-02-07SenateSecond Reading referred to Public Safety Committee then to Appropriations Committee
2017-02-06SenateAuthored by Senator Brecheen
2017-02-06SenateFirst Reading

Same As/Similar To

SB657 (Carry Over) 2017-05-31 - Died in conference

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
43A14101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43A14102Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Oklahoma State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.oklegislature.gov/BillInfo.aspx?Bill=sb657&Session=1800
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20INT/SB/SB657%20INT.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/SCS/SB657%20CS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20COMMITTEE%20SUBS/HCSS/SB657%20HCS.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20AMENDMENTS/Amendment%20&%20Engr/SB657%20HASB%20&%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20ENGR/SB/SB657%20ENGR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/HFLR/SB657%20HFLR.PDF
Texthttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/cf_pdf/2017-18%20FLR/SFLR/SB657%20SFLR.PDF
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/Senate/SB657_votes.htm
Roll Callhttp://webserver1.lsb.state.ok.us/CF/2017-18%20SUPPORT%20DOCUMENTS/VOTES/House/SB657_votes.htm

Bill Comments

feedback